NJ SJR70 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2025 - 50% progression
Action: 2025-01-30 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Women's Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Community Development and Womens Affairs Committee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Designates last weekend in October as "Honor Your Hometown Weekend."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designates last weekend in October as "Honor Your Hometown Weekend."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2025-01-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-09-30 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2025-01-30AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Women's Affairs Committee
2025-01-30SenatePassed by the Senate (37-0)
2024-09-30SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2024-01-29SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

AJR122 (Same As) 2024-02-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Women's Affairs Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback