NJ SJR68 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-24 - Substituted by AJR140
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Designates March 8th of each year as "International Women's Day" in New Jersey.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designates March 8th of each year as "International Women's Day" in New Jersey.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-24SenateSubstituted by AJR140
2022-03-10SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2022-03-03SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Same As/Similar To

AJR140 (Same As) 2022-03-28 - Approved P.L.2022, JR-1.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback