NJ SJR66 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-29 - Substituted by AJR72
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-29 - Substituted by AJR72
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates third full week of May in each year as "Diabetic Peripheral Neuropathy Awareness Week."
Title
Designates third full week of May in each year as "Diabetic Peripheral Neuropathy Awareness Week."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-29 | Substituted by AJR72 | |
2011-06-02 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2011-03-10 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR72 (Same As) 2011-09-26 - Approved P.L.2011, JR-8.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2010/SJR66 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/SJR/66_I1.HTM |