NJ SJR51 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future AJR23
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR38
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR38
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, JR-26.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, JR-26.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the "New Jersey State Commission on Urban Violence."
Title
Establishes the "New Jersey State Commission on Urban Violence."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for AJR189 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, JR-26. |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (71-0-2) |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Substituted for AJR189 |
2019-12-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-10-15 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
2018-09-27 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SJR51 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, JR-26.
SJR38 (Carry Over) 2017-07-13 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
AJR189 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by SJR51
SJR38 (Carry Over) 2017-07-13 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
AJR189 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by SJR51
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/SJR51 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/SJR/51_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=SJR51 |