NJ SJR34 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future AJR63
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR168
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR168
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-06 - Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-06 - Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Commission on Drunk and Impaired Driving.
Title
Establishes Commission on Drunk and Impaired Driving.
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. John McKeon [D] | Rep. Joe Danielsen [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] |
Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] | Rep. Anthony Verrelli [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for AJR64 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0) |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Substituted for AJR64 (1R) |
2019-12-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-12-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate Amendment (29-0) (Greenstein) |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SJR34 (Carry Over) 2020-01-06 - Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
AJR64 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by SJR34 (3R)
AJR168 (Carry Over) 2017-12-18 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
AJR64 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by SJR34 (3R)
AJR168 (Carry Over) 2017-12-18 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading