NJ SJR16 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SJR107

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-07 - Substituted by AJR44
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Designates June 4 of each year as "Tourette Syndrome Awareness Day" in New Jersey.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designates June 4 of each year as "Tourette Syndrome Awareness Day" in New Jersey.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-21 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-07SenateSubstituted by AJR44
2018-05-21SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-01-16SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Same As/Similar To

SJR107 (Carry Over) 2017-06-01 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
AJR44 (Same As) 2018-07-20 - Approved P.L.2018, JR-6.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback