NJ SJR16 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR78
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-13 - Substituted by AJR76
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-13 - Substituted by AJR76
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates September "Affordable Housing Awareness Month."
Title
Designates September "Affordable Housing Awareness Month."
Sponsors
Sen. Nia Gill [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Senate | Substituted by AJR76 |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SJR78 (Carry Over) 2015-05-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
AJR76 (Same As) 2017-05-11 - Approved P.L.2017, JR-5.
AJR76 (Same As) 2017-05-11 - Approved P.L.2017, JR-5.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2016/SJR16 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2016/SJR/16_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=SJR16 |