NJ SJR110 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on November 26 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Substituted by AJR175 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Urges Chief Innovation Officer to prioritize enhancement of NJOneApp to include all State anti-hunger programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urges Chief Innovation Officer to prioritize enhancement of NJOneApp to include all State anti-hunger programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-21SenateSubstituted by AJR175 (2R)
2019-01-31SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-11-26SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Same As/Similar To

AJR175 (Same As) 2019-05-09 - Approved P.L.2019, JR-8.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback