NJ SCR132 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-27 - Substituted by ACR166 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amends Legislative Code of Ethics to remove requirement that legislators disclose address of their home or principal residence.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends Legislative Code of Ethics to remove requirement that legislators disclose address of their home or principal residence.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-27SenateSubstituted by ACR166 (2R)
2023-02-23SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2023-02-16SenateTransferred to Senate Judiciary Committee
2023-02-09SenateTransferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2022-12-01SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee

Same As/Similar To

ACR166 (Same As) 2023-02-27 - Filed with Secretary of State

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback