NJ SCR127 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-15 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Approves updated FY2023 Financial Plan of NJ Infrastructure Bank.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Approves updated FY2023 Financial Plan of NJ Infrastructure Bank.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for ACR167 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-11-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-11-03 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-12-15AssemblyFiled with Secretary of State
2022-12-15AssemblyResolution Passed Assembly (78-0-0)
2022-12-15AssemblySubstituted for ACR167
2022-12-12AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2022-11-21AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2022-11-21SenatePassed by the Senate (36-0)
2022-11-03SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2022-10-27SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee

Same As/Similar To

ACR167 (Same As) 2022-12-15 - Substituted by SCR127

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback