NJ SCR125 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on November 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-11-23 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on November 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-11-23 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Congress to fully fund federal mandate regarding electronic health records at New Jersey VA health care facilities.
Title
Urges Congress to fully fund federal mandate regarding electronic health records at New Jersey VA health care facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-11-22 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-11-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-11-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-11-23 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2010-11-22 | Passed by the Assembly (79-0-0) | |
2010-11-22 | Substituted for ACR143 | |
2010-11-22 | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading | |
2010-11-22 | Passed by the Senate (34-0) | |
2010-10-14 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-09-23 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
ACR143 (Same As) 2010-11-22 - Substituted by SCR125
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2010/SCR125 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/SCR/125_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=SCR125 |