NJ S969 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S1831
Note: Carry Over of previous A3853
Note: Carry Over of previous A3853
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.384.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.384.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes loan redemption program for teachers in certain fields to redeem loan amounts received under New Jersey College Loans to Assist State Students Loan Program through employment in certain low performing schools.
Title
Establishes loan redemption program for teachers in certain fields to redeem loan amounts received under New Jersey College Loans to Assist State Students Loan Program through employment in certain low performing schools.
Sponsors
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] | Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] | Sen. Chris Brown [R] |
Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 74 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A2687 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A2687 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-18 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.384. |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-3-0) |
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend. |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2021-12-02 | Senate | 2nd Reading in the Senate on Concur. w/Governor's Recommend. (35-1) |
2021-11-08 | Senate | Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (73-1-0) |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Substituted for A2687 (ACS) |
2021-06-16 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-03-05 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1831 (Carry Over) 2019-12-12 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A2687 (Same As) 2021-06-24 - Substituted by S969
A3853 (Carry Over) 2019-12-12 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A2687 (Same As) 2021-06-24 - Substituted by S969
A3853 (Carry Over) 2019-12-12 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading