NJ S915 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S938

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-07 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Permits certain portion of municipal development trust funds to be spent on housing affordability assistance to veterans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permits certain portion of municipal development trust funds to be spent on housing affordability assistance to veterans.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-07AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
2019-01-31SenatePassed by the Senate (39-0)
2019-01-17SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-01-16SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

S938 (Carry Over) 2016-12-19 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
A696 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback