NJ S908 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S73
Note: Carry Over of previous A3778
Note: Carry Over of previous A3778
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2025-03-17 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2025-03-17 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires portable anti-choking devices be placed in schools.
Title
Requires portable anti-choking devices be placed in schools.
Sponsors
Sen. Kristin Corrado [R] | Sen. Parker Space [R] | Sen. Holly Schepisi [R] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] |
Sen. Carmen Amato [R] |
Roll Calls
2025-03-17 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2025-03-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S73 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A3778 (Carry Over) 2022-05-02 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A177 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A3778 (Carry Over) 2022-05-02 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A177 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee