NJ S895 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S762
Note: Carry Foward to future A3786
Note: Carry Foward to future S474
Note: Carry Foward to future A3786
Note: Carry Foward to future S474
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-16 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-16 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns certification of tax collectors.
Title
Concerns certification of tax collectors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-16 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-08 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-08 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-10-08 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2020-10-08 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S895 (Carry Over) 2021-12-16 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S895 (Carry Over) 2021-12-16 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S895 (Carry Over) 2021-12-16 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A3471 (Same As) 2021-02-22 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S895 (Carry Over) 2021-12-16 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S895 (Carry Over) 2021-12-16 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A3471 (Same As) 2021-02-22 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S895 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S1000/895_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S895 |