NJ S883 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on November 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-01 - Approved P.L.2018, c.134.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on November 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-01 - Approved P.L.2018, c.134.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes issuance of special Humane State license plates.
Title
Authorizes issuance of special Humane State license plates.
Sponsors
Sen. Nicholas Sacco [D] | Sen. Brian Stack [D] | Rep. Timothy Eustace [D] | Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] |
Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Rep. Kevin Rooney [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-09-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A2197 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-01 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2018, c.134. |
2018-09-27 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (79-0-0) |
2018-09-27 | Assembly | Substituted for A2197 |
2018-03-05 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2197 (Same As) 2018-09-27 - Substituted by S883 (1R)