NJ S873 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-4)
Status: Passed on May 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-27 - Approved P.L.2014, c.9.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-4)
Status: Passed on May 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-27 - Approved P.L.2014, c.9.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Permits adoptees and certain others to obtain adoptee's original birth certificate and other related information.
Title
Permits adoptees and certain others to obtain adoptee's original birth certificate and other related information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 56 N: 19 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 56 N: 19 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - Senate - Senate Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - Senate - Senate Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - Senate - Senate Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 8 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 27 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A1259 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 27 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A1259 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 8 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 56 N: 19 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - Senate - Senate Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - Senate - Senate Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - Senate - Senate Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 8 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 27 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A1259 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 27 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A1259 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 8 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-27 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2014, c.9. |
2014-05-22 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (56-19-3) |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend. |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (29-5) |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Emergency Resolution (30-1) (Vitale) |
2014-05-12 | Senate | 2nd Reading in the Senate on Concur. w/Governor's Recommend. (28-5) (Vitale) |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate |
2014-02-27 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (44-27-3) |
2014-02-27 | Assembly | Substituted for A1259 (1R) |
2014-02-27 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (24-8) |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1259 (Same As) 2014-02-27 - Substituted by S873 (1R)