NJ S869 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2623
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on December 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-17 - Approved P.L.2018, c.144.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on December 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-17 - Approved P.L.2018, c.144.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Permits establishment by county and four-year institutions of higher education of three plus one degree programs for receipt of baccalaureate degree after spending three years at county college and one year at senior institution.
Title
Permits establishment by county and four-year institutions of higher education of three plus one degree programs for receipt of baccalaureate degree after spending three years at county college and one year at senior institution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1890 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1890 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-17 | Senate | Approved P.L.2018, c.144. |
2018-10-29 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (40-0) |
2018-10-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2018-10-29 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0) |
2018-10-29 | Assembly | Substituted for A1890 (1R) |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-01 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading |
Same As/Similar To
S2623 (Carry Over) 2016-12-19 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
A1890 (Same As) 2018-10-29 - Substituted by S869 (1R)
A1890 (Same As) 2018-10-29 - Substituted by S869 (1R)