NJ S868 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1054
Note: Carry Foward to future S470
Note: Carry Over of previous A4799
Note: Carry Over of previous S1931
Note: Carry Foward to future S470
Note: Carry Over of previous A4799
Note: Carry Over of previous S1931
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-18 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Pending: Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-18 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Pending: Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes law regulating size limits of lobsters.
Title
Changes law regulating size limits of lobsters.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S868 (Carry Over) 2022-01-18 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
S868 (Carry Over) 2022-01-18 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A1661 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Food Security Committee
A4799 (Carry Over) 2020-10-19 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee
S1931 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
S868 (Carry Over) 2022-01-18 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A1661 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Food Security Committee
A4799 (Carry Over) 2020-10-19 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee
S1931 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/S868 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S1000/868_I1.HTM |