NJ S868 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S1990

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Approved P.L.2018, c.20.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Permits candidates for school board to circulate petitions jointly and be bracketed together on ballot; permits short nonpolitical designation of principles on petitions and ballots.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permits candidates for school board to circulate petitions jointly and be bracketed together on ballot; permits short nonpolitical designation of principles on petitions and ballots.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A2030 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-30AssemblyApproved P.L.2018, c.20.
2018-04-12AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (70-0-0)
2018-04-12AssemblySubstituted for A2030
2018-04-05AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-04-05AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
2018-03-26SenatePassed by the Senate (27-10)
2018-02-26SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee

Same As/Similar To

S1990 (Carry Over) 2017-01-23 - Combined with S1297 (SCS)
A2030 (Same As) 2018-04-12 - Substituted by S868

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback