NJ S851 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-20 - Substituted by A578 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-20 - Substituted by A578 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
"Good Samaritan Emergency Response Act"; eliminates criminal liability for persons who seek medical assistance in response to drug overdose.*
Title
"Good Samaritan Emergency Response Act"; eliminates criminal liability for persons who seek medical assistance in response to drug overdose.*
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-20 | Senate | Substituted by A578 (1R) |
2012-06-21 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2012-01-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A578 (Same As) 2012-10-11 - 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2012/S851 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/S1000/851_I1.HTM |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/S1000/851_R1.HTM |