NJ S85 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S1943
Note: Carry Over of previous A5792
Note: Carry Over of previous A5792
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Division of Minority and Women Business Development and State Chief Disparity Officer to monitor efforts to promote participation by minority-owned and women-owned businesses in State contracting.
Title
Establishes Division of Minority and Women Business Development and State Chief Disparity Officer to monitor efforts to promote participation by minority-owned and women-owned businesses in State contracting.
Sponsors
Sen. Nilsa Cruz-Perez [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] | Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] |
Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1943 (Carry Over) 2022-06-29 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A5792 (Carry Over) 2023-11-30 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A3936 (Same As) 2024-05-13 - Reported as an Assembly Committee Substitute and Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A5792 (Carry Over) 2023-11-30 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A3936 (Same As) 2024-05-13 - Reported as an Assembly Committee Substitute and Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S85 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S0500/85_I1.HTM |