NJ S847 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S1144

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Enrolled on June 25 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (33-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires school districts to provide daily recess period for students in grade kindergarten through 5; permits denial of recess for violation of code of student conduct but student must be provided restorative justice activities.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires school districts to provide daily recess period for students in grade kindergarten through 5; permits denial of recess for violation of code of student conduct but student must be provided restorative justice activities.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4076 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-25SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (33-0)
2018-06-25SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2018-06-21AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (74-0-3)
2018-06-21AssemblySubstituted for A4076
2018-06-18AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-03-05AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
2018-02-26SenatePassed by the Senate (38-1)
2018-02-01SenateSenate Amendment (35-0) (Turner)
2018-01-25SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

S1144 (Carry Over) 2016-06-27 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A1076 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A4076 (Same As) 2018-06-21 - Substituted by S847 (3R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback