NJ S846 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-03 - Approved P.L.2014, c.17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-03 - Approved P.L.2014, c.17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Enhances penalty for leaving the scene of boating accident.
Title
Enhances penalty for leaving the scene of boating accident.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A2725 Acs (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A2725 Acs (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A2725 Acs (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-03 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2014, c.17. |
2014-05-22 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (78-0-0) |
2014-05-22 | Assembly | Substituted for A2725/1185 (ACS) |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-02-27 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (36-0) |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1185 (Same As) 2014-05-08 - Combined with A2725 (ACS)
A2725 (Same As) 2014-05-22 - Substituted by S846/504 (SCS)
A2725 (Same As) 2014-05-22 - Substituted by S846/504 (SCS)