NJ S835 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S3430

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-21 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires State parks, forests, and other natural and historic areas to remain open to public for seven days if emergency is declared due to failure to enact general appropriation law as prescribed by NJ Constitution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires State parks, forests, and other natural and historic areas to remain open to public for seven days if emergency is declared due to failure to enact general appropriation law as prescribed by NJ Constitution.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-21 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-21SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-05-21SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3430 (Carry Over) 2017-11-30 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A1237 (Same As) 2018-06-29 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback