NJ S832 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Passed on January 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-19 - Approved P.L.2015, c.222.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Permits voter registration of certain persons at age17 for voting at next election occurring on or after18th birthday.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permits voter registration of certain persons at age17 for voting at next election occurring on or after18th birthday.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A2039 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-01-19AssemblyApproved P.L.2015, c.222.
2016-01-11AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-0-0)
2016-01-11AssemblySubstituted for A2039
2015-03-19AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2015-03-16SenatePassed by the Senate (39-0)
2015-02-24SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2014-01-14SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee

Same As/Similar To

A2039 (Same As) 2016-01-11 - Substituted by S832 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback