NJ S814 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3142
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-22 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-22 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires health insurers to limit patient cost-sharing and provide appeal process concerning certain prescription drug coverage.
Title
Requires health insurers to limit patient cost-sharing and provide appeal process concerning certain prescription drug coverage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-15 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-14 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-15 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-14 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-0) |
2016-12-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-11-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2016-11-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3142 (Carry Over) 2015-10-02 - Reviewed by the Pension and Health Benefits Commission Recommend not to enact
A2337 (Same As) 2016-10-06 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A2337 (Same As) 2016-10-06 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2016/S814 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2016/S1000/814_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S814 |