NJ S806 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S4159

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Enrolled on July 30 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-07-30 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that New Jersey Better Educational Savings Trust (NJBEST) Program scholarship may be awarded in any semester of attendance or enrollment at institution of higher education in State.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that New Jersey Better Educational Savings Trust (NJBEST) Program scholarship may be awarded in any semester of attendance or enrollment at institution of higher education in State.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A895 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-27 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-30AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-0-0)
2020-07-30AssemblySubstituted for A895
2020-07-27AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-07-23AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2020-03-05AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
2020-03-05SenatePassed by the Senate (40-0)
2020-02-13SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-01-30SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2020-01-30SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

S4159 (Carry Over) 2019-11-18 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A895 (Same As) 2020-07-30 - Substituted by S806

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback