NJ S786 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3599
Note: Carry Over of previous A5698
Note: Carry Over of previous S3905
Note: Carry Over of previous A5812
Note: Carry Over of previous A5698
Note: Carry Over of previous S3905
Note: Carry Over of previous A5812
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-18 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
Pending: Senate Higher Eduction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-18 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
Pending: Senate Higher Eduction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes $5 million in federal funds available to Stockton University to support North Athletic Complex project.
Title
Makes $5 million in federal funds available to Stockton University to support North Athletic Complex project.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3599 (Carry Over) 2021-06-03 - Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A5698 (Carry Over) 2021-06-28 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S3905 (Carry Over) 2021-06-30 - Substituted by A5851 (1R)
A5812 (Carry Over) 2021-06-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee
A5698 (Carry Over) 2021-06-28 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S3905 (Carry Over) 2021-06-30 - Substituted by A5851 (1R)
A5812 (Carry Over) 2021-06-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/S786 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S1000/786_I1.HTM |