NJ S784 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S789

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on January 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides a gross income tax exclusion for attorney's fees and costs received in connection with certain unlawful discrimination, unlawful retaliation, and qui tam claims or actions.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides a gross income tax exclusion for attorney's fees and costs received in connection with certain unlawful discrimination, unlawful retaliation, and qui tam claims or actions.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3614 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-10 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-17 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-31SenateAbsolute Veto, Received in the Senate
2018-12-17AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (79-0-0)
2018-12-17AssemblySubstituted for A3614
2018-12-10AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-12-10AssemblyRecommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2018-09-17AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-05-07AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
2018-04-12SenatePassed by the Senate (37-0)
2018-02-26SenateSenate Amendment (27-0) (Sarlo)
2018-02-15SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee

Same As/Similar To

S789 (Carry Over) 2016-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A3614 (Same As) 2018-12-17 - Substituted by S784 (1R)
A3942 (Same As) 2018-05-10 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback