NJ S781 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S534

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.216.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Revises penalties for certain violations of law by public movers and warehousemen.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises penalties for certain violations of law by public movers and warehousemen.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4884 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-09SenateApproved P.L.2019, c.216.
2019-06-20SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0)
2019-06-20SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2019-06-20AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (78-0-0)
2019-06-20AssemblySubstituted for A4884/3617 (ACS/2R)
2019-05-23AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
2019-03-18AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-03-18AssemblyRecommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2019-01-24AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-06-25AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
2018-06-25SenatePassed by the Senate (38-0)
2018-06-07SenateSenate Amendment (31-0) (Sarlo)
2018-05-21SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-02-15SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee

Same As/Similar To

S534 (Carry Over) 2016-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A3617 (Same As) 2019-01-24 - Combined with A4884 (ACS)
A4884 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S781 (4R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback