NJ S778 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3414
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-4)
Status: Passed on January 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.299.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-4)
Status: Passed on January 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.299.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Campus Sexual Assault Commission.
Title
Establishes Campus Sexual Assault Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1763 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.299. |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (77-0-0) |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Substituted for A1763 |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3414 (Carry Over) 2017-11-30 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A1763 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S778
A1763 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S778
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/S778 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/S1000/778_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S778 |