NJ S775 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S3107

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes Tuition Aid Grant Study Commission to examine New Jersey's Tuition Aid Grant Program and make recommendations regarding improvements to program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes Tuition Aid Grant Study Commission to examine New Jersey's Tuition Aid Grant Program and make recommendations regarding improvements to program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
2019-05-13SenatePassed by the Senate (35-0)
2019-03-25SenateSenate Amendment (28-0) (Cunningham)
2019-03-07SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3107 (Carry Over) 2017-05-01 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
A1997 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback