NJ S768 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S2619

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Approved P.L.2019, c.77.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Requires institutions of higher education to develop open textbook plan.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires institutions of higher education to develop open textbook plan.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A327 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02SenateApproved P.L.2019, c.77.
2019-03-25SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0)
2019-03-25SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2019-03-25AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (77-0-0)
2019-03-25AssemblySubstituted for A327/1149/3254 (ACS)
2018-06-18AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-02-01AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
2018-02-01SenatePassed by the Senate (40-0)
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading

Same As/Similar To

S2619 (Carry Over) 2016-12-19 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
A327 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Substituted by S768 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback