NJ S762 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S792
Note: Carry Foward to future A1282
Note: Carry Over of previous S990
Note: Carry Foward to future A1282
Note: Carry Over of previous S990
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires State Board of Education high school graduation requirements include instruction on tuition assistance programs and student loan debt; requires high school students to meet with guidance counselor to discuss tuition assistance and dual enrollment.
Title
Requires State Board of Education high school graduation requirements include instruction on tuition assistance programs and student loan debt; requires high school students to meet with guidance counselor to discuss tuition assistance and dual enrollment.
Sponsors
Sen. Sandra Cunningham [D] | Sen. Stephen Sweeney [D] | Sen. Robert Singer [R] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
Sen. Steven Oroho [R] | Sen. Fred Madden [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Sen. Chris Brown [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-01 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading |
Same As/Similar To
S762 (Carry Over) 2018-05-10 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S762 (Carry Over) 2018-05-10 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S990 (Carry Over) 2017-03-16 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A2773 (Same As) 2018-05-10 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S762 (Carry Over) 2018-05-10 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S990 (Carry Over) 2017-03-16 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A2773 (Same As) 2018-05-10 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading