NJ S726 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Passed on August 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-07 - Approved P.L.2017, c.184.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Extends full protection of Law Against Discrimination to persons having liability for service in Armed Forces of United States; guarantees equal employment opportunity in State contracting to all veterans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends full protection of Law Against Discrimination to persons having liability for service in Armed Forces of United States; guarantees equal employment opportunity in State contracting to all veterans.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A4460 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-09 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-07SenateApproved P.L.2017, c.184.
2017-06-22SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0)
2017-05-25SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2017-05-22AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (76-0-0)
2017-05-22AssemblySubstituted for A4460 (1R)
2017-03-06AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2016-11-14AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
2016-11-14SenatePassed by the Senate (36-0)
2016-06-09SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2016-01-12SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3115 (Carry Over) 2015-07-23 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A4460 (Same As) 2017-05-22 - Substituted by S726 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback