NJ S703 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S1472
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Approved P.L.2019, c.102.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Approved P.L.2019, c.102.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes pilot program in DOE to recruit disadvantaged or minority men to teach in certain underperforming schools under alternate route program.*
Title
Establishes pilot program in DOE to recruit disadvantaged or minority men to teach in certain underperforming schools under alternate route program.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3141 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.102. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (78-1-0) |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Substituted for A3141 (1R) |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (33-0) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1472 (Carry Over) 2017-12-07 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A3141 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Substituted by S703 (1R)
A3141 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Substituted by S703 (1R)