NJ S675 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S567
Note: Carry Foward to future A2988
Note: Carry Over of previous S2825
Note: Carry Over of previous A4245
Note: Carry Foward to future A2988
Note: Carry Over of previous S2825
Note: Carry Over of previous A4245
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides supplemental appropriation to DOE to provide additional State aid to certain school districts.
Title
Provides supplemental appropriation to DOE to provide additional State aid to certain school districts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S675 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
S675 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
S2825 (Carry Over) 2018-07-23 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A2359 (Same As) 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A4245 (Carry Over) 2018-06-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S675 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
S2825 (Carry Over) 2018-07-23 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A2359 (Same As) 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A4245 (Carry Over) 2018-06-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S675 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S1000/675_I1.HTM |