NJ S675 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2159
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-17 - Substituted by A1220
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-17 - Substituted by A1220
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
"Drama Therapists and Dance/Movement Therapists Licensing Act."
Title
"Drama Therapists and Dance/Movement Therapists Licensing Act."
Sponsors
Sen. Christopher Bateman [R] | Sen. Joseph Vitale [D] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Sen. Robert Gordon [D] |
Sen. Brian Stack [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-10 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-13 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-13 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-17 | Senate | Substituted by A1220 |
2018-12-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-09-13 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-09-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2159 (Carry Over) 2017-12-18 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A1220 (Same As) 2019-12-19 - Approved P.L.2019, c.273.
A1220 (Same As) 2019-12-19 - Approved P.L.2019, c.273.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/S675 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/S1000/675_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S675 |