NJ S630 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S3517

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-4)
Status: Passed on December 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-20 - Approved P.L.2018, c.162.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Provides governance, oversight, and accountability reforms at NJT.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides governance, oversight, and accountability reforms at NJT.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1241 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-10 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-20SenateApproved P.L.2018, c.162.
2018-12-17SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0)
2018-12-17SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2018-12-17AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (78-0-0)
2018-12-17AssemblySubstituted for A1241 (1R)
2018-12-10AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-06-11AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2018-06-07SenatePassed by the Senate (38-0)
2018-06-04SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-03-13SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-03-12SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3517 (Carry Over) 2017-11-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
A1241 (Same As) 2018-12-17 - Substituted by S630 (3R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback