NJ S606 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3470
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on November 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-06 - Approved P.L.2019, c.267.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on November 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-06 - Approved P.L.2019, c.267.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Encourages local units to plan for electric vehicle charging infrastructure.
Title
Encourages local units to plan for electric vehicle charging infrastructure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1371 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 4 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1371 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 4 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-06 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.267. |
2019-09-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (26-4) |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (67-4-1) |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | Substituted for A1371 (1R) |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (30-5) |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3470 (Carry Over) 2017-11-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A1371 (Same As) 2019-06-10 - Substituted by S606 (1R)
A1371 (Same As) 2019-06-10 - Substituted by S606 (1R)