NJ S598 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A208
Note: Carry Foward to future S1290
Note: Carry Over of previous S4187
Note: Carry Over of previous A5726
Note: Carry Foward to future S1290
Note: Carry Over of previous S4187
Note: Carry Over of previous A5726
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-06 - Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-06 - Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Raises pay for election workers to $300 per day; appropriates $7,000,000 to Department of State.
Title
Raises pay for election workers to $300 per day; appropriates $7,000,000 to Department of State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1527 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-15 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-15 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1527 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-15 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-15 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2021-12-02 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0) |
2021-12-02 | Assembly | Substituted for A1527 (1R) |
2021-11-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-11-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2021-11-08 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Emergency Resolution (38-0) (Beach) |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Senate Amendment (37-0) (Beach) |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S598 (Carry Over) 2021-12-06 - Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
S598 (Carry Over) 2021-12-06 - Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
S4187 (Carry Over) 2019-12-16 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A1527 (Same As) 2021-12-02 - Substituted by S598 (4R)
A5726 (Carry Over) 2019-08-23 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S598 (Carry Over) 2021-12-06 - Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
S4187 (Carry Over) 2019-12-16 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A1527 (Same As) 2021-12-02 - Substituted by S598 (4R)
A5726 (Carry Over) 2019-08-23 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee