NJ S585 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S695
Note: Carry Foward to future A1803
Note: Carry Over of previous S645
Note: Carry Over of previous A1837
Note: Carry Foward to future A1803
Note: Carry Over of previous S645
Note: Carry Over of previous A1837
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires public school student with concussion to be evaluated by physician or other licensed health care provider before return to school and return to physical activity at school.
Title
Requires public school student with concussion to be evaluated by physician or other licensed health care provider before return to school and return to physical activity at school.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S585 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
S585 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
S645 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A1599 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A1837 (Carry Over) 2018-10-18 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S585 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
S645 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A1599 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A1837 (Carry Over) 2018-10-18 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S585 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S1000/585_I1.HTM |