NJ S518 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S951
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Approved P.L.2017, c.43.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Approved P.L.2017, c.43.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires sanitation vehicles display flashing lights in certain circumstances and imposes conditions on drivers approaching sanitation vehicles displaying flashing lights; designated as "Michael Massey's Law."
Title
Requires sanitation vehicles display flashing lights in certain circumstances and imposes conditions on drivers approaching sanitation vehicles displaying flashing lights; designated as "Michael Massey's Law."
Sponsors
Sen. Jennifer Beck [R] | Rep. Joann Downey [D] | Rep. Eric Houghtaling [D] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] |
Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Sean Kean [R] | Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] |
Rep. Ralph Caputo [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A4452 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-29 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-29 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2017, c.43. |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-0-0) |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Substituted for A4452 |
2017-03-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-11-14 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
2016-11-14 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-1) |
2016-09-29 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S951 (Carry Over) 2015-11-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
A4452 (Same As) 2017-03-16 - Substituted by S518
A4452 (Same As) 2017-03-16 - Substituted by S518