NJ S486 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2793
Note: Carry Foward to future S2273
Note: Carry Over of previous S4232
Note: Carry Over of previous S1274
Note: Carry Over of previous A1652
Note: Carry Foward to future S2273
Note: Carry Over of previous S4232
Note: Carry Over of previous S1274
Note: Carry Over of previous A1652
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-24 - Senate Amendment (24-0) (Ruiz)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-24 - Senate Amendment (24-0) (Ruiz)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires delivery network company to maintain certain automobile insurance.
Title
Requires delivery network company to maintain certain automobile insurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Senate | Senate Amendment (24-0) (Ruiz) |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S486 (Carry Over) 2022-03-24 - Senate Amendment (24-0) (Ruiz)
S486 (Carry Over) 2022-03-24 - Senate Amendment (24-0) (Ruiz)
S4232 (Carry Over) 2021-12-06 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A3594 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
S1274 (Carry Over) 2020-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A1652 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S486 (Carry Over) 2022-03-24 - Senate Amendment (24-0) (Ruiz)
S4232 (Carry Over) 2021-12-06 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A3594 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
S1274 (Carry Over) 2020-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A1652 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee