NJ S483 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S1279

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
Pending: Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires hospitals and health care professionals to offer hepatitis C testing to certain individuals; authorizes certain laboratories to perform rapid hepatitis C testing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires hospitals and health care professionals to offer hepatitis C testing to certain individuals; authorizes certain laboratories to perform rapid hepatitis C testing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-05AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
2018-03-26SenatePassed by the Senate (35-1)
2018-03-05SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Same As/Similar To

S1279 (Carry Over) 2016-03-14 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
A3831 (Same As) 2018-04-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback