NJ S446 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2088
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on January 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.278.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on January 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.278.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Provides preferences for certain businesses applying for workforce development grants.
Title
Provides preferences for certain businesses applying for workforce development grants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4023 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-13 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-13 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-09 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.278. |
2019-11-25 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-0-0) |
2019-11-25 | Assembly | Substituted for A4023 |
2018-09-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2088 (Carry Over) 2016-05-02 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
A4023 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - Substituted by S446
A4023 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - Substituted by S446