NJ S4287 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-09 - Substituted by A6007
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-09 - Substituted by A6007
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires insurers and insurance groups to submit corporate governance annual disclosure to DOBI Commissioner.
Title
Requires insurers and insurance groups to submit corporate governance annual disclosure to DOBI Commissioner.
Sponsors
Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Reconsidered Vote (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-09 | Senate | Substituted by A6007 |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Reconsidered Vote (36-0) (Pou) |
2019-12-16 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2019-12-12 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-12-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A6007 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.350.