NJ S4278 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.451.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates $21 million from constitutionally dedicated CBT revenues to State Agriculture Development Committee for county planning incentive grants for farmland preservation purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriates $21 million from constitutionally dedicated CBT revenues to State Agriculture Development Committee for county planning incentive grants for farmland preservation purposes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A6108 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-09 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-21AssemblyApproved P.L.2019, c.451.
2020-01-13AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-0-0)
2020-01-13AssemblySubstituted for A6108
2020-01-09AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2020-01-09SenatePassed by the Senate (39-0)
2019-12-09SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2019-12-05SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee

Same As/Similar To

A6108 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S4278

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback