NJ S427 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S2528

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-13-2)
Status: Passed on June 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Approved P.L.2018, c.42.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Bars persons under age 18 from marrying or entering into a civil union.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bars persons under age 18 from marrying or entering into a civil union.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A865 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-22AssemblyApproved P.L.2018, c.42.
2018-06-07AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (59-0-12)
2018-06-07AssemblySubstituted for A865
2018-05-10AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-05-07AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
2018-04-12SenatePassed by the Senate (30-5)
2018-04-05SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2528 (Carry Over) 2017-03-13 - Substituted by A3091 (1R)
A865 (Same As) 2018-06-07 - Substituted by S427

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback